Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3053 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16459 Week
» 69475 Month
» 189002 Year
» 3215855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5381 |
06/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27033 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
06/04/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/04/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5381 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14C) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27033 |
|
|
24/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27033 |
|
|
28/02/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Thornton Yard |
|
|