Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2497 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15903 Week
» 68919 Month
» 188446 Year
» 3215299 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5382 |
18/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27034 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
18/04/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/04/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
11/02/1970 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5382 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14C) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27034 |
|
|
22/07/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27034 |
|
|
04/01/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|