Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 106 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5199 Week
» 7781 Month
» 272414 Year
» 1493979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5383 26/04/1962  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 27
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 26/04/1962
Withdrawn 15/01/1966
Time in Service 3 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1967
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
14A Cricklewood East (New) 26/04/1962
14C Bedford w/e 18/01/1964
14B Cricklewood West w/e 07/03/1964
D14 London (Midland) 16/01/1965
ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 06/03/1965
   Withdrawn 15/01/1966


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
26/04/1962 To Service To service as D5383
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A)
   
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (14C)    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14)    
06/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML)    
20/08/1965 Sightings The 18:45 Leicester - Wellingborough freight, headed by D5383, ran into the back of the preceding freight which was held at East Langton signals. Both cabs were crushed and the locomotive ended up on it's side and caught fire. The driver was killed, despite taking shelter in the rear cab, while the secondman survived by holding onto the locomotive boiler in the engine room.
The guard of the freight was blamed as he had allowed the service to run despite it being overweight (c. 957 tons).
The MoT report can be seen here. (7F02)
   
15/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as D5383    
01/06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev