Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 2339 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15745 Week
» 68761 Month
» 188288 Year
» 3215141 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5384 |
01/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27035 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
01/05/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5384 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
04/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27035 |
|
|
29/09/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27035 |
|
|
03/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|