Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1249 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19052 Week
» 72068 Month
» 191595 Year
» 3218448 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5398 |
03/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27039 |
05/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
03/07/1962 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/07/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5398 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27039 |
|
|
27/09/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
05/10/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27039 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|