Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 904 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 1977 Week
» 21303 Month
» 248064 Year
» 759166 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
HR 55   07/1921
LMS 14767 y/e 1924
BR 54767 y/e 10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1921 CLAN MACKINNON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Cumming
Class Highland Clan
Company History HR/LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Hawthorne Leslie
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3444
To Service During 07/1921
Withdrawal During 02/1950
Total Mileage 808,868
Service Life 28 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
32B Aviemore 4w/e 22/06/1946
32B Aviemore 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A Inverness 3w/e 11/12/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Inverness w/e 27/11/1948
WDN 60A Inverness 30/01/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1921 To Service To service as HR Number 55, name: CLAN MACKINNON
Built at Hawthorne Leslie, Works Number 3444
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 14767    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Aviemore (32B)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aviemore (32B)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 54767    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (32A)    
02/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 54767    

prev prev