Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 881 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 881 Week
» 23862 Month
» 387107 Year
» 463694 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5500 10/10/1957
TOPS (Tops) 31018 26/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/110/10/1957
31/015/03/1969
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 10/10/1957
Withdrawn 10/07/1976
Time in Service 18 yrs , 9 mths
Cut Up 10/07/1976
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 10/10/1957
31B March w/e 13/06/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 20/06/1959
30A Stratford w/e 23/06/1962
   Stored w/e 09/05/1976
   Withdrawn 10/07/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/03/1969 Reclassified from 30 to 31
 

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/10/1957 To Service To service as D5500
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/03/1969 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 31018    
09/05/1976 To Store To Store    
10/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 31018    

prev