Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 871 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 871 Week
» 23852 Month
» 387097 Year
» 463684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5501 25/11/1957
TOPS (Tops) 31001 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/125/11/1957
31/015/03/1969
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 25/11/1957
Withdrawn 10/07/1976
Time in Service 18 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 01/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 25/11/1957
   Stored w/e 09/05/1976
   Withdrawn 10/07/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/03/1969 Reclassified from 30 to 31
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/11/1957 To Service To service as D5501
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
15/03/1969 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31001    
09/05/1976 To Store To Store    
10/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 31001    
01/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev