Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 582 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1716 Week
» 21449 Month
» 318463 Year
» 395050 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5503 09/01/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31003 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/109/01/1958
31/026/10/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 09/01/1958
Withdrawn 03/02/1980
Time in Service 22 yrs , 25 dys
Cut Up 04/1980
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 09/01/1958
31B March w/e 09/05/1959
30A Stratford w/e 05/12/1959
   Withdrawn 03/02/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/01/1958 To Service To service as D5503
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
09/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
26/10/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31003    
03/02/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 31003    
04/1980 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev