Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 943 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4542 Week
» 10676 Month
» 238560 Year
» 1460125 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5504 30/01/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 31004 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/130/01/1958
31/023/11/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 30/01/1958
Withdrawn 05/10/1980
Time in Service 22 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 06/1981
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Information Disc Indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 30/01/1958
31B March w/e 13/06/1959
30A Stratford w/e 05/12/1959
MR March 2w/e 11/10/1975
SF Stratford 2w/e 25/01/1976
   Withdrawn 05/10/1980

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
23/11/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31      


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/01/1958 To Service To service as D5504
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/11/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31004    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
25/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
05/10/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 31004    
06/1981 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev