Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 576 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1710 Week
» 21443 Month
» 318457 Year
» 395044 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5505 20/02/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31005 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/120/02/1958
31/023/11/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 20/02/1958
Withdrawn 03/02/1980
Time in Service 21 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 03/1980
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 20/02/1958
   Withdrawn 03/02/1980

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/11/1968 Reclassified from 30 to 31
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/02/1958 To Service To service as D5505
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/11/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31005    
03/02/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 31005    
03/1980 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev