Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 222 Today
» 1220 Yesterday
» 222 Week
» 27696 Month
» 324710 Year
» 401297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5507 19/04/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31007 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/119/04/1958
31/015/03/1969
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 19/04/1958
Withdrawn 04/11/1976
Time in Service 18 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 07/1978
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 19/04/1958
31B March w/e 07/03/1959
30A Stratford w/e 05/12/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 17/09/1960
30A Stratford w/e 26/11/1960
   Stored w/e 09/05/1976
   Withdrawn 04/11/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/03/1969 Reclassified from 30 to 31
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/04/1958 To Service To service as D5507
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/03/1969 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31007    
09/05/1976 To Store To Store    
04/11/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 31007    
07/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev