Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4189 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17595 Week
» 70611 Month
» 190138 Year
» 3216991 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5507 |
19/04/1958 |
|
TOPS (31/0) |
31007 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
19/04/1958 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/02/1969 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/04/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/05/1963 |
Severe |
|
Not known |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/04/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5507 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31007 |
|
|
09/05/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
04/11/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31007 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
07/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|