Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 611 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1870 Week
» 24851 Month
» 388096 Year
» 464683 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5508 17/04/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31008 02/02/1974
Departmental (Dept) ADB968016 05/10/1980

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/117/04/1958
31/026/10/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 17/04/1958
Withdrawn 01/10/1980
Time in Service 22 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 06/1985
Cut At Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 17/04/1958
31B March w/e 07/03/1959
30A Stratford w/e 05/12/1959
31B March w/e 17/09/1960
30A Stratford w/e 23/06/1962
   Withdrawn 01/10/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/04/1958 To Service To service as D5508
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
26/10/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31008    
01/10/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 31008    
05/10/1980 Renumbered Renumbered to ADB968016    
06/1985 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev