Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 612 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1871 Week
» 24852 Month
» 388097 Year
» 464684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5509 01/05/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31009 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/101/05/1958
31/028/12/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 01/05/1958
Withdrawn 10/07/1976
Time in Service 18 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 11/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 01/05/1958
   Stored w/e 09/05/1976
   Withdrawn 10/07/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1968 Reclassified from 30 to 31
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/05/1958 To Service To service as D5509
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
12/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31009    
09/05/1976 To Store To Store    
10/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 31009    
11/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev