Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 881 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 881 Week
» 23862 Month
» 387107 Year
» 463694 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5510 16/05/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31010 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/116/05/1958
31/031/01/1969
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 16/05/1958
Withdrawn 10/07/1976
Time in Service 18 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys
Cut Up 12/1976
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 16/05/1958
31B March w/e 07/03/1959
30A Stratford w/e 09/01/1960
   Stored w/e 09/05/1976
   Withdrawn 10/07/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/05/1958 To Service To service as D5510
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/1969 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31010    
09/05/1976 To Store To Store    
10/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 31010    
12/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev