Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 312 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3774 Week
» 23507 Month
» 320521 Year
» 397108 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5511 05/06/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31011 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/105/06/1958
31/031/01/1969
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 05/06/1958
Withdrawn 10/07/1976
Time in Service 18 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys
Cut Up 01/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 05/06/1958
60A Inverness 4w/e 05/07/1958
30A Stratford 4w/e 13/09/1958
   Stored w/e 09/05/1976
   Withdrawn 10/07/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/06/1958 To Service To service as D5511
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
05/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
13/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/1969 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31011    
09/05/1976 To Store To Store    
10/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 31011    
01/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev