Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 302 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3764 Week
» 23497 Month
» 320511 Year
» 397098 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5513 13/07/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31013 01/01/1973
Departmental (Dept) ADB968013 05/03/1979

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/113/07/1958
31/004/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 13/07/1958
Withdrawn 01/03/1979
Time in Service 20 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 08/1983
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 13/07/1958
   Withdrawn 01/03/1979


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/07/1958 To Service To service as D5513
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
04/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31013    
01/03/1979 Withdrawn Condemned as 31013    
05/03/1979 Renumbered Renumbered to ADB968013    
08/1983 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev