Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2088 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19891 Week
» 72907 Month
» 192434 Year
» 3219287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5515 |
31/07/1958 |
|
TOPS (31/0) |
31015 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
31/07/1958 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
05/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
12/05/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/07/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
12/05/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
30/10/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/07/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5515 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
05/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31015 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/05/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/05/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31015 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
11/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|