Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 582 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1716 Week
» 21449 Month
» 318463 Year
» 395050 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5516 04/09/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31016 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/104/09/1958
31/031/01/1969
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 04/09/1958
Withdrawn 10/07/1976
Time in Service 17 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 12/1976
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 04/09/1958
32B Ipswich w/e 02/12/1967
30A Stratford w/e 11/05/1968
   Stored w/e 09/05/1976
   Withdrawn 10/07/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/09/1958 To Service To service as D5516
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
02/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/1969 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31016    
09/05/1976 To Store To Store    
10/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 31016    
12/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev