Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 899 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 899 Week
» 23880 Month
» 387125 Year
» 463712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5517 25/09/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31017 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/125/09/1958
31/026/10/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 25/09/1958
Withdrawn 04/05/1980
Time in Service 21 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 01/1983
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 25/09/1958
32B Ipswich w/e 07/10/1967
30A Stratford w/e 11/05/1968
31B March w/e 10/10/1970
30A Stratford w/e 24/10/1970
   Withdrawn 04/05/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/09/1958 To Service To service as D5517
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
26/10/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
10/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31017    
04/05/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 31017    
01/1983 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev