Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 57 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17860 Week
» 70876 Month
» 190403 Year
» 3217256 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5517 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
4575 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
249 |
To Service |
During 12/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/12/1958 |
Service Life |
31 yrs , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1927 |
MCH |
|
Machynlleth |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/12/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1927 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5517 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
01/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5517 |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|