Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 612 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1871 Week
» 24852 Month
» 388097 Year
» 464684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5518 16/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31101 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/116/10/1958
31/008/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 16/10/1958
Withdrawn 11/01/1993
Time in Service 34 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 17/03/1994
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 16/10/1958
31B March w/e 07/03/1959
30A Stratford w/e 17/09/1960
31B March w/e 24/10/1970
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 23/01/1971
30A Stratford w/e 03/04/1971
31B March w/e 07/10/1972
SF Stratford 3w/e 02/05/1976
   Withdrawn 11/01/1993

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/10/1958 To Service To service as D5518
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
24/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/01/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31101    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
11/01/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 31101    

prev prev