Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 313 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3775 Week
» 23508 Month
» 320522 Year
» 397109 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5519 12/12/1958
TOPS (Tops) 31019 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/112/12/1958
31/028/12/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 12/12/1958
Withdrawn 05/10/1980
Time in Service 21 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 08/1981
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 12/12/1958
31B March w/e 07/03/1959
30A Stratford w/e 26/11/1960
32B Ipswich w/e 07/10/1967
30A Stratford w/e 13/01/1968
   Withdrawn 05/10/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/12/1958 To Service To service as D5519
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
13/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31019    
05/10/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 31019    
08/1981 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev