Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 717 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1664 Week
» 20446 Month
» 268739 Year
» 1153120 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5521 05/03/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31103 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D13/105/03/1959
31/110/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/03/1959
Withdrawn 05/10/1980
Time in Service 21 yrs , 7 mths
Cut Up 02/1983
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Information Disc Indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 05/03/1959
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
30A Stratford w/e 03/04/1971
55B York (North) w/e 09/10/1971
FP Finsbury Park w/e 19/05/1973
SF Stratford 3w/e 02/05/1976
MR March w/e 23/05/1976
   Withdrawn 05/10/1980

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
20/07/1961 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/03/1959 To Service To service as D5521
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
10/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31103    
19/05/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
23/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
05/10/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 31103    
02/1983 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev