Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 3 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2864 Week
» 21646 Month
» 269939 Year
» 1154320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5522 12/03/1959
TOPS (31/4) 31418 12/11/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D13/112/03/1959
31/118/11/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 12/03/1959
Withdrawn 06/10/1995
Time in Service 36 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys
Cut Up 31/07/1999
Information Disc Indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 12/03/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 07/11/1959
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
30A Stratford w/e 03/04/1971
55B York (North) w/e 09/10/1971
CD Cricklewood East w/e 18/08/1973
FP Finsbury Park 2w/e 11/10/1975
91E To Eastern Region w/e 11/10/1975
GD Gateshead 3w/e 02/05/1976
   Withdrawn 06/10/1995

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
18/11/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
12/1973   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
26/10/1962 Severe   Not known Not known    
03/10/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/03/1959 To Service To service as D5522
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
18/11/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31418    
18/08/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CD)    
12/1973 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GD)    
06/10/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31418    

prev prev