Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 526 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2433 Week
» 21215 Month
» 269508 Year
» 1153889 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5524 26/03/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31106 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D13/126/03/1959
31/106/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 26/03/1959
Withdrawn 01/11/1995
Time in Service 36 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys
Information Disc Indicators
Status Awaiting Scrapping

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 26/03/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 25/04/1959
31B March w/e 20/06/1959
30A Stratford w/e 05/12/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 27/08/1960
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1972
SF Stratford w/e 16/05/1976
   Withdrawn 01/11/1995

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
06/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
31/01/1970   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
26/03/1959 To Service To service as D5524
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
25/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
06/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
31/01/1970 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31106    
16/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
01/11/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31106    

prev prev