Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5525 09/04/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31107 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D13/109/04/1959
31/111/09/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 09/04/1959
Withdrawn 31/10/2008
Time in Service 49 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 05/2009
Cut At Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham)
Information Disc Indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 09/04/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 05/10/1963
30A Stratford w/e 25/09/1965
40B Immingham w/e 23/04/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
30A Stratford w/e 03/04/1971
31B March w/e 08/01/1972
   Withdrawn 31/10/2008

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/1974   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
13/05/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/04/1959 To Service To service as D5525
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to March (31B)
   
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop.   Link
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
25/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31107    
11/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
31/10/2008 Withdrawn Condemned as 31107    
05/2009 Scrapped Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham    

prev prev