Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5526 16/04/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31108 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D13/116/04/1959
31/125/05/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 16/04/1959
Withdrawn 27/09/1991
Time in Service 32 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 18/07/1995
Information Disc Indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 16/04/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 07/11/1959
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
FP Finsbury Park w/e 09/03/1974
   Withdrawn 27/09/1991

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
25/05/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/04/1959 To Service To service as D5526
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
25/05/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31108    
09/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
27/09/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31108    

prev prev