Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 270 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2177 Week
» 20959 Month
» 269252 Year
» 1153633 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5528 30/04/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31110 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D13/130/04/1959
31/115/03/1969
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 30/04/1959
Withdrawn 31/05/2006
Time in Service 47 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy
Cut Up 04/2007
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information Disc Indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 30/04/1959
31B March w/e 20/06/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 31/10/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 16/09/1961
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 23/02/1963
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
40A Lincoln w/e 11/01/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 19/06/1965
32B Ipswich w/e 11/03/1967
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
81A Old Oak Common w/e 29/03/1969
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 10/03/1973
91E To Eastern Region 3w/e 09/10/1976
   Withdrawn 31/05/2006

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1969   Dual Braked  
15/03/1969   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
05/1970   Dual AWS Fitted  
04/1976   Dual AWS Removed  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
20/02/1961 Not severe   Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1959 To Service To service as D5528
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
23/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
15/03/1969 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
29/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/06/1969 Sightings Old Oak Common depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
05/1970 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31110    
10/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
04/1976 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
09/10/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
31/05/2006 Withdrawn Condemned as 31110    
04/2007 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev