Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 710 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1657 Week
» 20439 Month
» 268732 Year
» 1153113 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5531 21/05/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31113 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D13/121/05/1959
31/108/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/05/1959
Withdrawn 30/07/2004
Time in Service 45 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 08/2008
Cut At EMR (Kingsbury)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 21/05/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 07/11/1959
31B March w/e 26/11/1960
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
32B Ipswich w/e 16/09/1961
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 23/06/1962
32B Ipswich w/e 13/01/1968
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
52A Gateshead w/e 09/10/1971
40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1972
   Withdrawn 30/07/2004

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
08/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
08/1971   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
29/11/1963 Severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/05/1959 To Service To service as D5531
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
13/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
08/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
08/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31113    
30/07/2004 Withdrawn Condemned as 31113    
08/2008 Scrapped Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury    

prev prev