Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2204 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15610 Week
» 68626 Month
» 188153 Year
» 3215006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5531 |
21/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31113 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
21/05/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
13/08/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/05/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
13/08/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
29/11/1963 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5531 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
13/08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31113 |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
30/07/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31113 |
|
|
08/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|