Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 523 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2430 Week
» 21212 Month
» 269505 Year
» 1153886 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5532 04/06/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31114 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D13/104/06/1959
31/118/11/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 04/06/1959
Withdrawn 01/11/1995
Time in Service 36 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 12/2001
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 04/06/1959
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
52A Gateshead w/e 09/10/1971
30A Stratford w/e 06/11/1971
31B March w/e 08/01/1972
SF Stratford 3w/e 02/05/1976
   Withdrawn 01/11/1995

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
18/11/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/06/1959 To Service To service as D5532
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
18/11/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
06/11/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31114    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
01/11/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31114    
12/2001 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev