Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 768 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6373 Week
» 17920 Month
» 417602 Year
» 494189 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5532   06/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 4575
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1928
Withdrawal During 07/1962
Service Life 34 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86H Aberbeeg 7w/e 31/08/1952
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 26/12/1953
82C Swindon 4w/e 29/11/1958
82D Westbury 4w/e 13/06/1959
83D Laira 4w/e 28/11/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1928 To Service To service as GWR Number 5532
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5532    

prev prev