Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 447 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1832 Week
» 8637 Month
» 115583 Year
» 1337148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5534 m/e 06/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 4575
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1928
Withdrawal During 09/1960
Scrapping During 01/1961 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 32 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
82C Swindon 4w/e 21/03/1953
88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/10/1953
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 12/06/1958
88C Barry 4w/e 14/06/1958
86F Tondu 4w/e 21/03/1959
83E St Blazey 4w/e 30/01/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1928 To Service To service as GWR Number 5534
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (86F)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 5534    
01/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev