Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1162 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18965 Week
» 71981 Month
» 191508 Year
» 3218361 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5535 |
18/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31117 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
18/06/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
20/11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
23/11/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
05/1970 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/06/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
20/11/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
05/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
09/03/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5535 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
20/11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
30/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31117 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
11/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31117 |
|
|
09/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: at Doncaster Works |
|
|