Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1025 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3124 Week
» 14695 Month
» 262988 Year
» 1147369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5536 18/06/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31118 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/218/06/1959
31/107/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/06/1959
Withdrawn 20/02/1989
Time in Service 29 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 01/1990
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 18/06/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 07/11/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
30A Stratford w/e 10/08/1968
81A Old Oak Common w/e 24/05/1969
   Withdrawn 20/02/1989

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
07/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
04/1969   Dual Braked  
05/1970   Dual AWS Fitted  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/06/1959 To Service To service as D5536
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
07/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
10/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
04/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
24/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/06/1969 Sightings Old Oak Common depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
05/1970 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31118    
20/02/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 31118    
01/1990 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev