Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 353 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18156 Week
» 71172 Month
» 190699 Year
» 3217552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5537 |
25/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31119 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
To Service |
25/06/1959 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
09/1995 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
Information |
4-digit route indicators |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
25/06/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
09/03/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/06/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
09/03/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
26/09/1964 |
Unknown |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Not known |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5537 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
07/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
07/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
09/03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31119 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
09/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31119 |
|
|