Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 189 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 1262 Week
» 20588 Month
» 247349 Year
» 758451 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5538   07/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 4575
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 07/1928
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 33 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83F Truro 4w/e 30/01/1960
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 17/06/1961
89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 15/07/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1928 To Service To service as GWR Number 5538
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (83F)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 5538    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Triangle. SLS 1/1962 Link

prev prev