Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 388 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18191 Week
» 71207 Month
» 190734 Year
» 3217587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5539 |
09/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31121 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
09/07/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/12/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
06/1970 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/07/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/12/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 04/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Electrical insulation |
ECS |
|
17/08/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
05/01/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5539 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
23/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
22/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31121 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
06/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
01/09/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31121 |
|
|
09/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|