Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 420 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2866 Week
» 14571 Month
» 346060 Year
» 422647 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5539   07/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 4575
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 07/1928
Withdrawal During 04/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83A Newton Abbot 8w/e 11/07/1953
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 23/04/1955
86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 03/11/1956
83E St Blazey 4w/e 22/02/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1928 To Service To service as GWR Number 5539
Built at Swindon Works
   
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5539    

prev prev