Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 1020 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3119 Week
» 14690 Month
» 262983 Year
» 1147364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5541 23/07/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31123 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/223/07/1959
31/103/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 23/07/1959
Withdrawn 16/03/1992
Time in Service 32 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 02/2006
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 23/07/1959
41A Tinsley w/e 03/04/1965
55C Healey Mills w/e 29/05/1971
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 09/10/1971
51L Thornaby w/e 29/07/1972
41A Tinsley w/e 11/11/1972
HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 19/05/1973
YK York (North) w/e 08/03/1975
OC Old Oak Common 3w/e 09/10/1976
   Withdrawn 16/03/1992

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
30/04/1970   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
19/11/1964 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/07/1959 To Service To service as D5541
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
29/04/1965 Sightings An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station John Thickitt - station visit Link
30/04/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
29/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
29/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31123    
19/05/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
09/10/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
16/03/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 31123    
02/2006 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev