Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2008 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19811 Week
» 72827 Month
» 192354 Year
» 3219207 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5542 |
30/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31124 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
30/07/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/07/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/09/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Not known |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5542 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
23/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
22/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31124 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
25/05/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31124 |
|
|
11/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|