Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1744 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19547 Week
» 72563 Month
» 192090 Year
» 3218943 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5543 |
30/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31125 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
30/07/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/07/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5543 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31125 |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
12/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31125 |
|
|
05/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|