Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 528 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 21217 Month
» 269510 Year
» 1153891 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5543 30/07/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31125 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/230/07/1959
31/108/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 30/07/1959
Cut Up 05/2001
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 30/07/1959
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
40B Immingham w/e 05/03/1966
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 25/03/1967
30A Stratford w/e 25/05/1968
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 12/10/1968
41A Tinsley w/e 29/03/1969
31B March w/e 10/10/1970
41A Tinsley w/e 30/01/1971
51L Thornaby w/e 09/10/1971
FP Finsbury Park 4w/e 06/10/1973

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
08/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/07/1959 To Service To service as D5543
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
25/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
12/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
29/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
10/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
30/01/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31125    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
05/2001 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury    

prev prev