Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5544 20/08/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31126 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/220/08/1959
31/107/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 20/08/1959
Withdrawn 14/01/2000
Time in Service 40 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys
Cut Up 05/1999
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 20/08/1959
40B Immingham w/e 07/01/1967
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 25/03/1967
41A Tinsley w/e 14/06/1969
31B March w/e 10/10/1970
41A Tinsley w/e 30/01/1971
51L Thornaby w/e 09/10/1971
FP Finsbury Park 4w/e 06/10/1973
   Withdrawn 14/01/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
07/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
14/06/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/08/1959 To Service To service as D5544
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
07/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
07/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
14/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
10/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
30/01/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31126    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
22/06/1975 Sightings At Kings Cross - Stabling point    
05/1999 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    
14/01/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31126    

prev prev