Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1483 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14889 Week
» 67905 Month
» 187432 Year
» 3214285 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5544 |
20/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31126 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
20/08/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/08/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
14/06/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5544 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
07/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31126 |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
05/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|
14/01/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31126 |
|
|