Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 786 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14192 Week
» 67208 Month
» 186735 Year
» 3213588 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5545 |
m/e |
10/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
4575 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
253 |
To Service |
During 10/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 27/11/1964 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/12/1963 |
Southall MPD |
GWR5508/31/45/64/9/70/1 have arrived all ex-store at various sheds (except 5531 ex Laira in very good external condition) and are being used on e.c.s. and pilot duties instead of 0-6-0PTs. |
SLS/196401 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5545 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
13/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Penzance (83G) |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
27/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5545 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|