Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5546 27/08/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31128 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/227/08/1959
31/108/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 27/08/1959
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 27/08/1959
31B March w/e 12/09/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 09/01/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 31/07/1965
31B March w/e 10/10/1970
41A Tinsley w/e 30/01/1971
40B Immingham w/e 08/05/1971
31B March w/e 12/08/1972

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/1974   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/08/1959 To Service To service as D5546
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
31/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
10/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
30/01/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31128    
11/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    

prev prev