Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 9 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2870 Week
» 21652 Month
» 269945 Year
» 1154326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5548 03/09/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31130 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/203/09/1959
31/102/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 03/09/1959
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 03/09/1959
31B March w/e 06/08/1966
40B Immingham w/e 07/01/1967
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
41A Tinsley w/e 07/10/1967
40B Immingham w/e 10/01/1970
52A Gateshead w/e 29/05/1971
51L Thornaby w/e 08/01/1972
41A Tinsley w/e 11/11/1972
TE Thornaby w/e 11/05/1974

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
02/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
08/1969   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
16/07/1962 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    
16/07/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/09/1959 To Service To service as D5548
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
10/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
29/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31130    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    

prev prev